Don Cunningham
5429 Ovando Way
Las Vegas Nv,89122
(702) 586-8257
donald.cunningham77@yahoo.com
Objective: To use my current Military Maintenance and 15+ years in the IT/Office skills to assist
My prospective employer achieve there business goals.
Qualifications:
OshKosh Certified / Trained on the new M-ATV Armored Vehicle.
Navistar Certified / Trained on the Maxpro single/dual armored Vehicle.
Current Experience on the new OshKosh Hemmit Wrecker
Generator Experience , Cummings,Perkins,Cat
Hvac Experience , Vehicle A/C Systems , Industrial Systems.
ASV,Pandur 4×4 and 6×6 Experience.
I have Experience with the following Engines. Cummings, Detroit Diesel, Caterpillar, Mercedes Benz
Transmissions, Allison, General Electric
Previous Supervisory experience
Experience: US Army/ USMC DOD Contractor
AGS/AECOM
1/30/2009 – Present
Afghanistan
Lead Mechanic
Allied Trades installing aoa and full vehicle maintenance and repair. I also am currently working on Mrap, vehicles , RG31A1,A2,Maxpro,Cougar 4X4 and Jerrv 6X6 doing full suspension repair and replacement, Annual Services, all battle damage to vehicle body To include all electrical and Hyd repairs. I also work on the M114, S and M1151 doing Annual Services, full suspension repair and replacing and any other work required. I also do R134 AC repair/service.
I also have been working on Cat heavy equipment, Graders, bulldozers etc. I also have experience with John Deere 150KW diesel generator service and repair.
Gould Global Associates
2/16/2008 – 12/10/2008
Contractor for General Dynamics Land Systems Division Europe
Pandur AGMS / Stryker Program Lead Mechanic
Duties are to provide full reset program duties on the Pandur 1 vehicle for the US Army
In Vienna Austria. My duties are to rebuild or repair all vehicle components, engine, transmission repairs or overhaul. I also repair all hydraulic, electrical wiring harness, all electrical boxes and drivers instruments controls. I also do all armor repairs and upgrades. This is a full 6 wheeled vehicle rebuild.
Lear Siegler Inc
1/13/2006 – 2/15/2008
DOD Army Contractor
Camp Liberty Baghdad Iraq
Main battle Tank Repair Master Mechanic, QA/QC Inspector
I am currently the QA/QC inspector for the LSI track team performing all acceptances
Inspections, in progress inspections and final vehicle inspection. Using DA Forms
DA2407, DA2404, DA5980, DA5999. As a Mechanic and also assistant Master Tech
I am responsible for training all new employee’s, I perform all -10 thru -40 levels
Scheduled/Unscheduled Maintenance on the following family of tracked vehicles.
M1A1, M1A2SEP, M88A1, M88A2, M109A6, M99A2, M113A2, M113A3, M2A3
And M577A2, M577A3. Maintenance performed is all services hull and -10 Level Turret maintenance,
I also perform all Hydraulic, Electrical, Fuel, and Suspension Repair/Replacement/Troubleshooting
Needed to release the vehicle to the using unit Fully Mission Capable.
MWO
Camp Al-Asad Iraq
Duties included installing Add on Armor, Fire suppression Kits, Seat Belts on ARMY/MARINE Corps
M998, M114 Humvee Vehicle’s.
Heavy Wheeled Mechanic
Al-ASAD Iraq
My Duties as a heavy wheeled mechanic included Engine, Transmission, Suspension removal and
Installation. I also did major suspension replacement in accordance with Oshkosh FSR Recommendations
On The HEMET/PLS Vehicle’s. Other duties included Electrical, Hydraulic, Fuel system troubleshooting, repair and replacement. I worked on the following ARMY Family of Heavy Wheeled Vehicle’s.
M984, M985, M977, M978, M983, M1120, M1074, M1000 Hemet Trailer. I also performed Maint on refueling Trailers. All Work and Safety Precautions are to return the vehicle to the using unit in Mission Capable Readiness.
Wal-Mart
2/2005 – 1/2006
Colorado Springs, CO
Overnight Stocker/Support Manager
Customer Support Manager
My duties at Wal-Mart as a night time Stocker/Supt Mgr was to insure all merchandise was stocked in a timely manor, I also was responsible for supporting the night time staff and Mgt in completing our nightly mission completed. I also supported my co-workers in there area’s of responsibility
To assure us all completed on time. As a Customer Support Manager I was responsible for all cashiers on duty ranging 20 employees per shift in regards to there breaks, meals and end of shift replacement.
I was heavy involved in all currency tracking and collection before, during and at shift change. I interacted very heavily with customers on a daily basis in helping them with all there questions and needs and complaints.
Spherion
Colorado Springs, CO
3/2003 – 1/2005
IT/Helpdesk Specialist / Shift Lead
My duties were to support a World – Wide Customer base on the following Platforms, HP3000 MPE, 1/
HP UNIX, HP Windows Servers. My responsibility was to serve HP customers on the Mainframe Servers
On Finance, Order Processing, Shipping Receiving and HR Applications. I also supported the Windows customers with Outlook, MSACCESS, Printing and application issues.
As Shift Lead I was responsible for all agents receiving and owning all incoming trouble tickets within our customers issued deadline’s , To include resolving all customers needs,compalints and other related issues.
Hewlett – Packard / Agilent Technology
Palo Alto, CA / Colorado Springs, CO
4/1989 – 2/2003
System Administrator
My duties at HP/Agilent was a Computer Operator and worked my way up to a Systems Administrator
For our HR, Finance, Order Processing and Invoicing. I supported our World – Wide customer base
From Database Administration/Analyst Role. I performed Project Management duties for 5 years in projects ranging from 1.5 million dollar budget to convert our Payroll and Order Processing Applications
From the IBM to HP Platform. I worked on a team of 15 people re-writing and creating new programs and applications.
I also have 5 years Experience in Direct – Hiring Recruiting for Summer Seeds and Fulltime Employee’s
For our HR & Finance departments to include Programmers and Application Support. During my Career
At HP/Agilent I performed many duties to include Manager of the OMS Team of 10 People around the world during out transition from HP to Agilent. I have Database Administration, Programming, and JCL
Creation and System Design and Building. I used all Microsoft Office Products on a daily basis, Microsoft Word, Excel Spreadsheet, Outlook Mail, MSACCESS, and Power Point.
FMC Corporation
San Jose, CA
1/1985 – 4/1988
Test Track Mechanic
At FMC I was responsible for all final Assembly checks for the M113 Family, AAVP7, C7, R7 and
MRLS, Bradley. As a test track Mechanic I finished all outstanding issues from the assembly to include repairing all defects found by the FMC QQ/QC Inspector. Engine,Transmission,Hull and Turret problems with Electrical Wiring Harnesses , Fuel Systems , Hydraulic Systems , Instrument Panels and Drivers
Compartment. All work performed complied with FMC & Government Inspection Requirements. I was also responsible for breaking in all finished vehicles prior to lot inspection by the Decaspro Government inspectors.
United States Marine Corps
11/1975 – 11/1984
MOS 1833
RANK E5
I was an Amtrak Crewman / Mechanic on the LVTP7 now called AAV’S, I was also an instructor
At the AAV School at Camp Pendleton CA, Other duties while I served were as a Platoon Leader.
I was awarded the Good Conduct Award and Star for second award, schools Attended were 1833
Crewmember course, NCO Leadership Course, Advance Life Saving School. I was also an Expert
At Marksmanship 7 years in a row. I attended many classes over my career related to Maintenance
In the 1800 Field.
Education
Saint Louis High School Graduated 1977
San Jose City College
COBOL Programming GPA: 3.5 1989
Deanza College GPA: 3.5 1990/1992
Pascal Programming, English, C+ Programming
Foothills College GPA: 3.5 1992/1994
Business, UNIX, US History 1, 2, English, Math Algebra, Philosophy
Accounting 1, 2
MAJOR
Business / Computer Science
References Available Upon Request